There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PPP Data and Diversity Accountability Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to require collection and reporting of demographic data for applicants of the Paycheck Protection Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/14/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/14/2020Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/14/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/14/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/15/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/15/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/15/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/15/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/15/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/15/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/15/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/19/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/19/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/19/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/19/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/19/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/19/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/19/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/19/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/22/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 05/22/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/22/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/22/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/28/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/28/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/04/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/04/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/11/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/15/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 06/25/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/25/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 07/20/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business05/14/2020 Referred to

As of 08/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6861 - PPP Data and Diversity Accountability Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6861. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/14/2020)

PPP Data and Diversity Accountability Act of 2020

This bill requires the Small Business Administration to collect and report specified demographic data for recipients of assistance under the Paycheck Protection Program established to support small businesses in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).