Text: H.R.691 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/18/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 691


To amend the Healthy Forests Restoration Act of 2003 to authorize insect and disease treatment programs on certain Federal land, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

January 18, 2019

Mr. Walden introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To amend the Healthy Forests Restoration Act of 2003 to authorize insect and disease treatment programs on certain Federal land, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Proven Wildfire Reduction Techniques Act of 2019”.

SEC. 2. Treatment areas.

Section 602 of the Healthy Forests Restoration Act of 2003 (16 U.S.C. 6591a) is amended—

(1) in the heading, by striking “Designation of”;

(2) by amending subsection (a) to read as follows:

“(a) Definitions.—In this section:

“(1) COOS BAY WAGON ROAD GRANT LANDS.—The term ‘Coos Bay Wagon Road Grant lands’ means the lands reconveyed to the United States pursuant to the first section of the Act of February 26, 1919 (40 Stat. 1179).

“(2) DECLINING FOREST HEALTH.—The term ‘declining forest health’ means a qualified forest that is experiencing—

“(A) substantially increased tree mortality due to insect or disease infestation; or

“(B) dieback due to infestation or defoliation by insects or disease.

“(3) OREGON AND CALIFORNIA RAILROAD GRANT LANDS.—The term ‘Oregon and California Railroad Grant lands’ means the following lands:

“(A) All lands in the State of Oregon revested in the United States under the Act of June 9, 1916 (39 Stat. 218), that are administered by the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Bureau of Land Management, pursuant to the first section of the Act of August 28, 1937 (43 U.S.C. 1181a).

“(B) All lands in that State obtained by the Secretary of the Interior pursuant to the land exchanges authorized and directed by section 2 of the Act of June 24, 1954 (43 U.S.C. 1181h).

“(C) All lands in that State acquired by the United States at any time and made subject to the provisions of title II of the Act of August 28, 1937 (43 U.S.C. 1181f).

“(4) PUBLIC LANDS.—The term ‘public lands’ has the meaning given that term in section 103 of the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 (43 U.S.C. 1702), except that the term includes Coos Bay Wagon Road Grant lands and Oregon and California Railroad Grant lands.

“(5) QUALIFIED FOREST.—The term ‘qualified forest’ means a forest located in—

“(A) National Forest System lands; or

“(B) public lands.

“(6) SECRETARY CONCERNED.—The term ‘Secretary concerned’ means—

“(A) with respect to National Forest System lands, the Secretary of Agriculture; and

“(B) with respect to public lands, the Secretary of the Interior.”;

(3) by amending subsection (b) to read as follows:

“(b) Authority.—The Secretary concerned may carry out insect and disease treatment programs in a qualified forest that meets the requirements specified in subsection (c).”;

(4) in subsection (c), by striking “To be designated a landscape-scale area under subsection (b), the area shall be” and inserting “The Secretary concerned may only carry out projects under subsection (b) in a qualified forest that is”; and

(5) in subsection (d)(1), by striking “on Federal land in the areas designated”.


Share This Section