There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Paycheck Recovery Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Treasury to establish a grant program for employers adversely affected by COVID-19, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/19/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
05/19/2020Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/2020Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/2020Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/19/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/19/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/19/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 05/19/2020
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 05/22/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/22/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/22/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/22/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 05/22/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/22/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/28/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/28/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/04/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/01/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 07/09/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/20/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 07/20/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/24/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/07/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/07/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/19/2020 Referred to
House Judiciary05/19/2020 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/19/2020 Referred to

As of 08/12/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6918 - Paycheck Recovery Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6918. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/19/2020)

Paycheck Recovery Act of 2020

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to establish a paycheck recovery program to provide grants for certain small businesses and employers that have lost revenue because of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) to pay wages and fixed expenses such as rent, utilities, and safety equipment.

Treasury shall award such grants to employers that have experienced revenue losses above a 10% gross receipts threshold or to small businesses that employ 20 or fewer individuals and have annual gross receipts of less than $3 million. Recipients shall receive an initial, 90-day grant that covers the percentage of revenue loss multiplied by wages provided to an employee (up to a salary cap of $90,000), plus an additional 25% of total wages to cover business operating costs. Subsequent grants shall be disbursed on a monthly basis until the nationwide unemployment rate remains below 7% for three consecutive months, at which point Treasury shall terminate the program.

An employer receiving a grant must meet certain conditions related to share repurchases, payments to shareholders or bondholders, and executive compensation and bonuses, as well as conditions relating to labor protections such as keeping employees on payroll and benefits.

The bill also establishes a Congressional Paycheck Recovery Program Implementation Oversight Board to ensure employers that receive grants use the funds appropriately and comply with all conditions.