There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Pre-existing Conditions Protection Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to prohibit application of pre-existing condition exclusions and to guarantee availability of health insurance coverage in the individual and group market, contingent on the enactment of legislation repealing the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
01/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/05/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/05/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 02/05/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/05/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 02/05/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 02/05/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 02/05/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/05/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/05/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/05/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/06/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/06/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 02/06/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/06/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/06/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 02/08/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/08/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/08/2019
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/08/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/08/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 02/13/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/13/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 02/19/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 02/19/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 02/19/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 02/26/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/11/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 03/14/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 04/01/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/01/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/01/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 04/02/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/02/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/03/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 04/08/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 04/25/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/29/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/07/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/07/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/08/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 05/08/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 05/09/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 05/15/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 05/15/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/16/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 05/20/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 08/06/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/16/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/18/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor01/18/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/18/2019 Referred to

As of 12/11/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.692 - Pre-existing Conditions Protection Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.