There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Guard COVID-19 Earned Benefits Guarantee Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretaries of Defense and Veterans Affairs to treat a period of full-time National Guard duty, performed in response to the national emergency declared on March 13, 2020, by the President with respect to COVID-19, as not shorter than 90 days.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/22/2020Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2020Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 05/22/2020
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 05/22/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/22/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 05/26/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 05/28/2020
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/28/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/28/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/01/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/01/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/01/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/11/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/11/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/15/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 06/15/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/22/2020 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs05/22/2020 Referred to

As of 07/02/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6957 - National Guard COVID-19 Earned Benefits Guarantee Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6957. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2020)

National Guard COVID-19 Earned Benefits Guarantee Act

This bill requires the Department of Defense and the Department of Veterans Affairs to treat full-time National Guard duty performed in response to the national emergency with respect to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) as a period of not shorter than 90 days (i.e., the threshold usually required for eligibility for certain retirement and education benefits).

Members of Congress are excluded and must deploy for not fewer than 90 days to receive similar benefits eligibility.