There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cash Refunds for Coronavirus Cancellations Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for cash refunds for canceled airline flights and tickets during the COVID-19 emergency.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
05/26/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/22/2020Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2020Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 05/27/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/27/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/27/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/27/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/27/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 06/11/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/11/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/11/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/11/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/15/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/22/2020
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 06/22/2020
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/22/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/22/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/22/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/22/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation05/26/2020 Referred to
House Financial Services05/22/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6965. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2020)

Cash Refunds for Coronavirus Cancellations Act of 2020

This bill requires air carriers and ticket agents to offer full cash refunds for all cancelled tickets during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) emergency period, regardless of whether the air carrier cancelled an entire flight or the passengers cancelled their individual tickets.

The bill permits air carriers and tickets agents to offer alternative forms of compensation, including credit, or vouchers, provided that such offer is valid indefinitely and the offer includes a clear and conspicuous notice of the passenger's right to a cash refund.

Additionally, the bill provides that passengers who received an alternative form of compensation prior to the enactment of this bill, but have not used it, may request a cash refund to replace the alternative compensation.