There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

U.C.S. ME/CFS Act
Understanding COVID-19 Subsets and ME/CFS Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize and provide for the expansion, intensification, and coordination of the programs and activities of the National Institutes of Health with respect to post-viral chronic neuroimmune diseases, specifically myalgic encephalomyelitis/chronic fatigue syndrome (ME/CFS), to support the COVID-19 response, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/28/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/28/2020Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/20/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 07/20/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/07/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 08/07/2020
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 08/07/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 08/07/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 08/07/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/07/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/07/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 08/07/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/07/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 08/14/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/14/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/14/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 08/14/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 08/14/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 08/14/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 08/14/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/14/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 08/28/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 08/28/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/28/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/28/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/28/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 08/28/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 08/28/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 08/28/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/04/2020
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 09/04/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/04/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/04/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/01/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/01/2020
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 10/01/2020
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 10/01/2020
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/01/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/01/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/01/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 10/01/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 10/01/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 10/01/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/01/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/09/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/09/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/09/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 10/09/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/12/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/12/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/12/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 11/12/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/28/2020 Referred to

As of 12/03/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7057 - U.C.S. ME/CFS Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.