There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

American Critical Mineral Exploration and Innovation Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the domestic exploration, research, development, and processing of critical minerals to ensure the economic and national security of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/28/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
06/26/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/28/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Small Business, the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Small Business, the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Small Business, the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Small Business, the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/2020Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Small Business, the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/28/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/28/2020
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 05/28/2020
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 05/28/2020
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 05/28/2020
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/28/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/11/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/11/2020
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/11/2020
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/11/2020
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 06/11/2020
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 06/11/2020
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/11/2020
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/11/2020
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 06/11/2020
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 06/11/2020
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/11/2020
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 06/11/2020
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 06/18/2020
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 07/09/2020
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/09/2020
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/16/2020
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/22/2020
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 08/11/2020

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/28/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources06/26/2020 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology05/28/2020 Referred to
House Small Business05/28/2020 Referred to
House Judiciary05/28/2020 Referred to
House Education and Labor05/28/2020 Referred to

As of 09/18/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7061 - American Critical Mineral Exploration and Innovation Act of 2020


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.