There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reopening America by Supporting Workers and Businesses Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide relief to workers impacted by COVID-19 and support for reopening businesses, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/01/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/01/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/01/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 06/01/2020
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 06/01/2020
Rep. Garcia, Mike [R-CA-25] 06/04/2020
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/04/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 06/04/2020
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 06/04/2020
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/04/2020
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/04/2020
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/11/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/11/2020
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/11/2020
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 06/11/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 06/11/2020
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 06/15/2020
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 06/15/2020
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/15/2020
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 06/15/2020
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/15/2020
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 06/18/2020
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 06/18/2020
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 06/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/01/2020 Referred to

As of 10/23/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7066 - Reopening America by Supporting Workers and Businesses Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7066. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/01/2020)

Reopening America by Supporting Workers and Businesses Act of 2020

This bill permits states to provide not more than two weekly payments of $600 to individuals who were eligible for pandemic unemployment compensation during any week after the enactment of this bill but who are no longer eligible as a result of becoming thereafter reemployed. A state may make such payments as a lump sum.

Additionally, states participating in pandemic unemployment programs must (1) establish a process for employers to report when an individual refuses an offer of employment; and (2) provide individuals claiming unemployment benefits with notice of the state’s laws with respect to returning, or refusing to return, to work.