There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Coronavirus County Relief and Stability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title VI of the Social Security Act to establish the Coronavirus County Relief Fund, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/04/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/30/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/04/2020Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2020Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 06/04/2020
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/04/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/04/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform06/04/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/04/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands06/30/2020 Referred to

As of 10/20/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7090 - Coronavirus County Relief and Stability Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7090. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/2020)

Coronavirus County Relief and Stability Act

This bill appropriates $36 billion for a Coronavirus County Relief Fund to make payments to counties to compensate for revenue lost and costs incurred as a result of the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency.

Specifically, a county shall use the funds to compensate for direct loss of revenue due to the public health emergency or to cover its costs that

  • are necessary expenditures incurred due to the public health emergency,
  • were not accounted for in the budget most recently approved as of February 29, 2020, and
  • were incurred from March 1, 2020-December 30, 2020.

Each county shall receive a flat payment plus an amount based on its population.

The bill provides funding for the Office of Inspector General of the Department of the Treasury to conduct monitoring and oversight of the receipt, disbursement, and use of such funds.

The bill reauthorizes the payments in lieu of taxes program, which compensates local governments for tax revenue lost due to tax-exempt federal lands within their boundaries.