Text: H.R.7090 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/2020)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 7090 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 7090

     To amend title VI of the Social Security Act to establish the 
        Coronavirus County Relief Fund, and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                              June 4, 2020

  Mr. Cook (for himself, Mr. Carbajal, Mr. LaMalfa, and Mr. Panetta) 
 introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on 
   Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural 
 Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, 
 in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the 
                jurisdiction of the committee concerned

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
     To amend title VI of the Social Security Act to establish the 
        Coronavirus County Relief Fund, and for other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Coronavirus County Relief and 
Stability Act''.

SEC. 2. CORONAVIRUS COUNTY RELIEF FUND.

    Title VI of the Social Security Act (as added by section 5001 of 
the CARES Act (Public Law 116-136)) is amended by adding after section 
601 the following:

``SEC. 602. CORONAVIRUS COUNTY RELIEF FUND.

    ``(a) Appropriation.--Out of any money in the Treasury of the 
United States not otherwise appropriated, there are appropriated for 
making payments to counties under this section, $36,000,000,000 for 
fiscal year 2020.
    ``(b) Authority To Make Payments.--Not later than 30 days after the 
date of enactment of this section, the Secretary shall pay each county 
that submits the certification described in section (e) the amount 
determined for the county for fiscal year 2020 under subsection (c).
    ``(c) Payment Amounts.--
            ``(1) In general.--The amount paid under this section for 
        fiscal year 2020 to a county shall be an amount equal to the 
        sum of--
                    ``(A) $1,000,000; and
                    ``(B) the amount equal to the relative population 
                proportion amount determined under paragraph (2) for 
                such fiscal year.
            ``(2) Relative population proportion amount.--For purposes 
        of paragraph (1), the relative population proportion amount 
        determined under this paragraph for a county for fiscal year 
        2020 is the product of--
                    ``(A) the portion of the amount appropriated under 
                subsection (a) for fiscal year 2020 remaining after 
                taking into account amounts paid pursuant to paragraph 
                (1)(A); and
                    ``(B) the relative county population proportion (as 
                defined in paragraph (3)).
            ``(3) Relative county population proportion defined.--For 
        purposes of paragraph (2)(B), the term `relative county 
        population proportion' means, with respect to a county, the 
        quotient of--
                    ``(A) the population of the county; and
                    ``(B) the total population of all counties.
            ``(4) Data.--For purposes of this subsection, the 
        population of counties shall be determined based on the most 
        recent year for which data are available from the Bureau of the 
        Census and shall include all incorporated and unincorporated 
        populations within the county.
    ``(d) Use of Funds.--A county shall use the funds provided under a 
payment made under this section--
            ``(1) to cover only those costs of the county that--
                    ``(A) are necessary expenditures incurred due to 
                the public health emergency with respect to the 
                Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19);
                    ``(B) were not accounted for in the budget most 
                recently approved as of February 29, 2020; and
                    ``(C) were incurred during the period that begins 
                on March 1, 2020, and ends on December 30, 2020; and
            ``(2) to compensate for any direct loss of revenue to the 
        county as a result of such public health emergency.
    ``(e) Certification.--In order to receive a payment under this 
section, a county shall provide the Secretary with a certification 
signed by the Chief Executive for the county that the county's proposed 
uses of the funds are consistent with subsection (d).
    ``(f) Inspector General Oversight; Recoupment.--
            ``(1) Oversight authority.--The Inspector General of the 
        Department of the Treasury shall conduct monitoring and 
        oversight of the receipt, disbursement, and use of funds made 
        available under this section.
            ``(2) Recoupment.--If the Inspector General of the 
        Department of the Treasury determines that a county has failed 
        to comply with subsection (d), the amount equal to the amount 
        of funds used in violation of such subsection shall be booked 
        as a debt of such entity owed to the Federal Government. 
        Amounts recovered under this subsection shall be deposited into 
        the general fund of the Treasury.
            ``(3) Appropriation.--Out of any money in the Treasury of 
        the United States not otherwise appropriated, there are 
        appropriated to the Office of the Inspector General of the 
        Department of the Treasury, $8,500,000 to carry out oversight 
        and recoupment activities under this subsection. Amounts 
        appropriated under the preceding sentence shall remain 
        available until expended.
            ``(4) Authority of inspector general.--Nothing in this 
        subsection shall be construed to diminish the authority of any 
        Inspector General, including such authority as provided in the 
        Inspector General Act of 1978 (5 U.S.C. App.).
    ``(g) Definitions.--In this section:
            ``(1) County.--The term `county' means a parish in 
        Louisiana, a borough in Alaska, or a county in the other 48 
        States.
            ``(2) Secretary.--The term `Secretary' means the Secretary 
        of the Treasury.''.

SEC. 3. REAUTHORIZATION OF PAYMENTS IN LIEU OF TAXES PROGRAM.

    Section 6906 of title 31, United States Code, is amended in the 
matter preceding paragraph (1) by striking ``fiscal year 2019'' and 
inserting ``each of fiscal years 2021 through 2025''.
                                 <all>

Share This