There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (15)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Johnny Isakson and David P. Roe, M.D. Veterans Health Care and Benefits Improvement Act of 2020

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Deborah Sampson Act of 2020
  • FREE Veteran Act of 2020
  • Financial Refuge for Every Elderly Veteran Act of 2020
  • Navy SEAL Bill Mulder Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DELIVER Act
Dependable Employment and Living Improvements for Veterans Economic Recovery Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Homeless Veterans Coronavirus Response Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Johnny Isakson and David P. Roe, M.D. Veterans Health Care and Benefits Improvement Act of 2020

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Deborah Sampson Act of 2020
  • FREE Veteran Act of 2020
  • Financial Refuge for Every Elderly Veteran Act of 2020
  • Navy SEAL Bill Mulder Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To provide flexibility for the Secretary of Veterans Affairs in caring for homeless veterans during a covered public health emergency, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a retraining assistance program for unemployed veterans, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To provide flexibility for the Secretary of Veterans Affairs in caring for homeless veterans during a covered public health emergency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-315.
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020Presented to President.
12/16/2020Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7169-7204)
12/09/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2020Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/23/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/04/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-315.
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020HousePresented to President.
12/16/2020-3:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2020-3:23pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7169-7204)
12/16/2020-2:21pmHouseThe House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 7105.
12/16/2020-2:20pmHouseMr. Takano moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7169-7211)
12/10/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/09/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7369-7370)
12/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.2696 Amendment SA 2696 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.2696 Amendment SA 2696 proposed by Senator Inhofe for Senator Moran. (consideration: CR S7372; text: CR S7369-7370) In the nature of a substitute.
12/09/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7372)
12/09/2020SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/24/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/23/2020-1:39pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2020-1:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2020-1:39pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4754-4760)
09/23/2020-1:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7105.
09/23/2020-1:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4754-4763)
09/23/2020-1:13pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/13/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/04/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/04/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/04/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs06/04/2020 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity07/13/2020 Referred to
House Budget06/04/2020 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/24/2020 Referred to
12/09/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (91)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.7105. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/23/2020)

Dependable Employment and Living Improvements for Veterans Economic Recovery Act or the DELIVER Act

This bill addresses the employment and retraining of veterans and the administration of Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) programs and benefits for homeless veterans, specifically during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency.

Among other provisions, the bill

  • modifies provisions relating to the administration of programs for homeless veterans, including by authorizing the VA to reallocate specified grant funds to provide homeless veterans and veterans participating in the Department of Housing and Urban Development-VA Supportive Housing (HUD-VASH) program with transportation, assistance required for safety and survival, and communications equipment and services;
  • expands eligibility for HUD-VASH rental assistance vouchers;
  • requires the VA to make grants to eligible entities that provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk for homelessness (with at least 10% of funding being utilized for women veterans);
  • modifies the rates for per diem payments granted to organizations that furnish services to homeless veterans;
  • permanently extends the referral and counseling services program for veterans who are at risk of homelessness and are transitioning from certain institutions (e.g., penal institutions);
  • authorizes the VA to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the Department of Health and Human Services under which managers of the Indian Health Service may provide case management assistance to veterans who receive housing vouchers under the Tribal HUD-VASH program;
  • requires certain VA medical facilities to enter into a contract or agreement with eligible entities to provide case management services to veterans as part of the HUD-VASH program;
  • requires the VA to implement a program providing up to 12 months of nontransferable retraining assistance to up to 17,250 eligible veterans for the pursuit of a specified program of education;
  • provides access to the National Directory of New Hires to the VA and the Department of Labor for the purpose of tracking the employment of veterans;
  • reauthorizes and expands the program for the provision of off-base transition training for veterans and their spouses, including by requiring a preference for participation by states with economies significantly impacted by COVID-19; and
  • adjusts certain loan fees related to the VA home loan guaranty program for loans refinanced after specified dates.