There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a clinical trial of the effects of cannabis on certain health outcomes of adults with chronic pain and post-traumatic stress disorder, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/20/2019Committee Hearings Held.
04/30/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
02/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E78)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/25/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 01/25/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 01/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/25/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/25/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/25/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/25/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 01/29/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/29/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/29/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/29/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/29/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/06/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/06/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/06/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/06/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 02/13/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/13/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 02/13/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 02/15/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 02/15/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/15/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/15/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/28/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/28/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/28/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 02/28/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/07/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/07/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/07/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/07/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 03/14/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 03/14/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/25/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/03/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/03/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/03/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 04/08/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 04/08/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/12/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 04/18/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/07/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/07/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/28/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/28/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/05/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/11/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/10/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/15/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 07/17/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/30/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/30/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 08/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/06/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/06/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/16/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/16/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/18/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/18/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/22/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/22/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 10/22/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 10/23/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/14/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/23/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Hearings by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/08/2019 Referred to
04/30/2019 Hearings by

As of 11/15/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.712 - VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.