There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a clinical trial of the effects of cannabis on certain health outcomes of adults with chronic pain and post-traumatic stress disorder, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
03/12/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/12/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/20/2019Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/30/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
02/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E78)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/25/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 01/25/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 01/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/25/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/25/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/25/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/25/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 01/29/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/29/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/29/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/29/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/29/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/29/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 02/06/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/06/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/06/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/06/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 02/13/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/13/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 02/13/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 02/15/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 02/15/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/15/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/15/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/28/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/28/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/28/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 02/28/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/07/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 03/07/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/07/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/07/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/07/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 03/14/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 03/14/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/25/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/01/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/03/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/03/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/03/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 04/08/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 04/08/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/12/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/12/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 04/18/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/07/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/07/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/28/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/28/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/05/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/11/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/10/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/15/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 07/17/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/30/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/30/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 08/06/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/06/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/06/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/16/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/16/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/18/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/18/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/22/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/22/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 10/22/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 10/23/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/14/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 11/15/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/15/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 11/15/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/03/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/17/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/09/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/09/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/09/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/13/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/13/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 01/13/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/13/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 01/15/2020
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/14/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 02/14/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 03/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/23/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Hearings by
03/12/2020 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/08/2019 Referred to
04/30/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.712. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/23/2019)

VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to conduct a clinical trial of the effects of medical-grade cannabis on the health outcomes of covered veterans diagnosed with chronic pain, and also those diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder. Covered veterans are those who are enrolled in the VA patient enrollment system for hospital care and medical services.