There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

VA FOIA Reform Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to reduce the backlog of requests for information made to the Department of Veterans Affairs pursuant to section 552 of title 5, United States Code, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/11/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
09/17/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/17/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/23/2020Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/01/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/11/2020Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 06/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/11/2020 Referred to
07/23/2020 Hearings by
09/17/2020 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations07/01/2020 Referred to

As of 11/23/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7163 - VA FOIA Reform Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7163. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/11/2020)

VA FOIA Reform Act of 2020

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to reduce the backlog of Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) requests by 75% within three years of enactment of the bill. Additionally, the VA must reduce the backlog of Office of Special Counsel requests made to the VA by 75% within three years of the enactment of this bill.

The VA must determine the types of documents, records, and information that are frequently requested under FOIA and must regularly make such documents, records, and information publicly available.

Finally, the VA must request that the Office of Government Information Services within the National Archives and Records Administration conduct an assessment of the VA's compliance with FOIA.