There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Raise the Age Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit a Federal firearms licensee from selling or delivering certain semiautomatic centerfire rifles to a person under 21 years of age, with exceptions for active duty military personnel and full-time law enforcement officers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/23/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/23/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/23/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 01/23/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/23/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 02/08/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/14/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/26/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/03/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/23/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/04/2019 Referred to

As of 05/27/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.717 - Raise the Age Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.717. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/23/2019)

Raise the Age Act

This bill establishes new restrictions on the sale or transfer of certain semiautomatic firearms to individuals under 21 years of age.

Specifically, this bill makes it unlawful for a licensed gun dealer, importer, manufacturer, or collector to sell or deliver a semiautomatic center-fire rifle that has the capacity to accept more than five rounds to an individual who the licensee knows or has reasonable cause to believe is under age 21.

The prohibition does not apply if the individual under age 21 is a full-time law enforcement officer or active-duty member of the Armed Forces.

The bill also requires the Federal Bureau of Investigation to report on the operation of its public access line, including a description of information sharing protocols and recommendations for improving such protocols.