There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

MICRO Act
Make Identifiable Criminal Rounds Obvious Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require certain semiautomatic pistols manufactured, imported, or sold by Federal firearms licensees to be capable of microstamping ammunition, and to prohibit the removal, obliteration, or alteration of the microstamped code or microstamping capability of a firearm.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 01/23/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 01/23/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 01/23/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/24/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 03/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/23/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/23/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/04/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.719.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.719. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/23/2019)

Make Identifiable Criminal Rounds Obvious Act or the MICRO Act

This bill requires certain semiautomatic pistols to be capable of microstamping ammunition. A pistol is capable of microstamping ammunition if (1) the characters that identify the make, model, and serial number of the pistol are etched into the breech face and firing pin of the pistol; and (2) these characters are copied onto the cartridge case of the ammunition when the pistol fires such ammunition.

Specifically, the bill prohibits a federal firearms licensee (e.g., a gun dealer) from manufacturing, importing, or transferring a semiautomatic pistol that is not capable of microstamping ammunition. Violators are subject to fines.

The bill also makes it unlawful for any person to remove, obliterate, or alter the microstamped code or microstamping capability of a firearm that has been shipped or transported in interstate or foreign commerce. Violators are subject to fines and suspension or revocation of any firearms license.