There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Small Business PPE Tax Credit Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide a tax credit for personal protective equipment to small businesses, non-profits, independent contractors, veterans' organizations, and farmers, among other entities, in any year in which the President declares a national emergency relating to COVID-19.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/15/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/15/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 06/15/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/15/2020
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 06/15/2020
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19]* 06/15/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 06/15/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 06/15/2020
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/15/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 06/18/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/18/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/18/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/18/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/18/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/18/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/18/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/18/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 06/18/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 06/18/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/24/2020
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/24/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/24/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/24/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/24/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 06/24/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 06/29/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/29/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/29/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 06/29/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 07/01/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/09/2020
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/09/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/09/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/09/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/09/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 07/13/2020
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 07/13/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 07/23/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/23/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 07/23/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/23/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 07/23/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/27/2020
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/09/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means06/15/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.7216.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7216. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/2020)

Small Business PPE Tax Credit Act

This bill allows certain small businesses a tax credit for the cost of qualified personal protective equipment, up to $25,000 in a taxable year. The entities eligible for such credit include farms, nonprofit organizations, veterans organizations, and Tribal business concerns. The bill defines qualified personal protective equipment to include the cost of equipment for reducing the risk of coronavirus (i.e., the virus that causes COVID-19) transmission. including gloves, facial masks and protective gear, and cleaning supplies.