There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Juneteenth National Independence Day Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to establish Juneteenth Independence Day as a Federal holiday, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/18/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/18/2020Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (158)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/18/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/18/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/18/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 06/18/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 06/24/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/24/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/24/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/24/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/24/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/24/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 06/24/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/24/2020
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/24/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/24/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/24/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/24/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/24/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/24/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 06/24/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/24/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/24/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/24/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/24/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 06/24/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/24/2020
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/25/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 06/25/2020
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 06/25/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/25/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/25/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 06/25/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/25/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/25/2020
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/25/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/25/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/25/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/25/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/25/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/25/2020
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 06/25/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/25/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/25/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/25/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/25/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/25/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 06/25/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/25/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/25/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/25/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/25/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/25/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2020
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 06/25/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/25/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/25/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/26/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/26/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/29/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/29/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/29/2020
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/29/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/29/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/29/2020
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/29/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 06/29/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 06/29/2020
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/30/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 06/30/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 07/01/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/09/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 07/09/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/09/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/13/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 07/16/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/20/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 08/22/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/11/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 10/09/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Reform06/18/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7232. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/18/2020)

Juneteenth National Independence Day Act

This bill establishes Juneteenth Independence Day as a federal holiday.