There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Promoting Fair and Effective Policing Through Research Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for research to examine law enforcement policies and practices, including the causes, consequences, and mitigation of excessive use of force, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/18/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
08/01/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/18/2020Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2020Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2020Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2020Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E545)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/30/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/30/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/30/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/09/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 07/09/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology06/18/2020 Referred to
House Homeland Security06/18/2020 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation08/01/2020 Referred to
House Judiciary06/18/2020 Referred to

As of 09/29/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7252 - Promoting Fair and Effective Policing Through Research Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.