There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title VIII of the Public Health Service Act to extend advanced education nursing grants to support clinical nurse specialist programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/17/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/11/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/11/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
01/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (129)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/23/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/28/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/28/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/28/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 01/28/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/28/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/28/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/28/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/28/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/28/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 01/28/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/28/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/28/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/28/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/28/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/28/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/28/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/28/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 01/28/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/28/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/29/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 01/29/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/29/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 01/29/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/29/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/05/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/05/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/05/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/05/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/05/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/05/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/05/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/05/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 02/05/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/08/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 02/08/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/08/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 02/13/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/28/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/28/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/28/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 03/05/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/11/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/13/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/18/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/29/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/29/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/29/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/29/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/03/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/08/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/08/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 04/12/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/12/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 04/15/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 04/15/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/02/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/02/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/02/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 05/14/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/10/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/10/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/10/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 06/18/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/21/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/21/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/25/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/26/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/10/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/10/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 07/10/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/11/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 07/12/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 07/12/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 07/12/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/17/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/17/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 07/23/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 08/02/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/27/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/11/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/23/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2019 Referred to
07/11/2019 Markup by
07/11/2019 Reported by

As of 09/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.728 - Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.