There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title VIII of the Public Health Service Act to extend advanced education nursing grants to support clinical nurse specialist programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/28/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8513-8514)
09/24/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-216.
01/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/29/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
10/28/2019-6:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/28/2019-6:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8513-8514)
10/28/2019-6:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 728.
10/28/2019-6:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8513-8516)
10/28/2019-6:06pmHouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/24/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
09/24/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-216.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/11/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/11/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
01/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/23/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/23/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (130)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/23/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 01/23/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/28/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/28/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/28/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 01/28/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/28/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/28/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/28/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/28/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/28/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 01/28/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/28/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/28/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/28/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/28/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/28/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/28/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/28/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 01/28/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/28/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/29/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 01/29/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/29/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 01/29/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/29/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/05/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/05/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/05/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/05/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/05/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/05/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/05/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/05/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/05/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/05/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 02/05/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 02/08/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 02/08/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/08/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/13/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 02/13/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/25/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/28/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/28/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/28/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 03/05/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/11/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/13/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/18/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/18/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/29/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/29/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/29/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/29/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/03/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/03/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/08/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/08/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 04/12/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/12/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 04/15/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 04/15/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/02/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 05/02/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/02/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/02/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 05/14/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/03/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/10/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/10/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/10/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 06/18/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/21/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/21/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/25/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 06/26/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/10/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/10/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 07/10/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/11/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 07/12/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 07/12/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 07/12/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/17/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/17/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 07/23/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 08/02/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/27/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/11/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 09/17/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/23/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
09/24/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-216
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2019 Referred to
07/11/2019 Markup by
07/11/2019 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions10/29/2019 Referred to

As of 02/24/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.728 - Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.