There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe Reservation Restoration Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe Reservation Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the transfer of certain Federal land in the State of Minnesota for the benefit of the Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2020Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-665.
01/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
12/18/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 549.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/18/2020Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-665.
09/30/2020Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/30/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/30/2020Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
09/30/2020Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
06/05/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States
02/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/23/2019 Referred to
09/30/2020 Markup by
12/18/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-665
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States02/08/2019 Referred to
06/05/2019 Hearings by
09/30/2020 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/08/2019 Referred to
09/30/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.733. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (12/18/2020)

Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe Reservation Restoration Act

This bill directs the Department of Agriculture to transfer to the administrative jurisdiction of the Department of the Interior all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to approximately 11,760 acres of identified federal land in the Chippewa National Forest in Cass County, Minnesota. Immediately upon transfer, the federal land shall be held in trust for the benefit of the Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe and considered as a part of its reservation.

The federal land shall not become eligible or be used for gaming activities under the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act.