There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Child Educational Freedom Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand school choice opportunities for children of active duty members of the Armed Forces of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/24/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 01/29/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/29/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/07/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 02/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/24/2019 Referred to

As of 06/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.740 - Military Child Educational Freedom Act.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.740. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2019)

Military Child Educational Freedom Act

This bill modifies the requirements for tax-exempt Coverdell education savings accounts to permit members of the Armed Forces serving on extended active duty or their spouses to use the accounts for certain education expenses incurred in connection with a home school that provides elementary or secondary education. The home school must be treated under state law as a home school or a private school.