There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFE Workers Act
Secure And Fair Elections for Workers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the National Labor Relations Board to implement a system and procedures to conduct representation elections remotely using an electronic voting system, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/02/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/02/2020Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/02/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/02/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/02/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/16/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 07/16/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/16/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 07/16/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2020
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/16/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/16/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/16/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/16/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/16/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/16/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/16/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 07/24/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/24/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 07/24/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/31/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 07/31/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 08/14/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 08/14/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 08/14/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/04/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/04/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/04/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/13/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor07/02/2020 Referred to

As of 10/28/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7485 - SAFE Workers Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7485. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/02/2020)

SAFE Workers Act or the Secure And Fair Elections for Workers Act

This bill requires the National Labor Relations Board (NLRB) to provide employees with the ability to vote remotely by telephone or the internet in union representation elections during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency.

The bill further permits the NLRB's use of appropriations to issue directives or regulations providing for electronic voting methods.