There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

COVID PREPARE Act of 2020
COVID Preparedness, Response, and Effective Planning for Advanced Requirements by the Executive Branch Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

COVID PREPARE Act
COVID Preparedness, Response, and Effective Planning for Advanced Requirements by the Executive Branch Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require Federal agencies to submit plans for responding to any resurgence of COVID-19, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/06/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/01/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/30/2020-1:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2020-1:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5075)
09/30/2020-12:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7496.
09/30/2020-12:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5075-5077)
09/30/2020-12:54pmHouseMr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/16/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
09/16/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Reform
07/22/2020HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3620)
07/06/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
07/06/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (31)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform07/06/2020 Referred to
09/16/2020 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/01/2020 Referred to

As of 10/23/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7496 - COVID PREPARE Act of 2020


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.7496. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/30/2020)

COVID Preparedness, Response, and Effective Planning for Advanced Requirements by the Executive Branch Act of 2020 or the COVID PREPARE Act of 2020

This bill requires federal agencies to submit to Congress plans for responding to any resurgence of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).

Specifically, each agency shall submit (1) an initial report detailing an action plan, informed by research and best practices learned from the onset of COVID-19 and previous presidentially declared emergencies, for addressing the needs and mitigating and eliminating the risks and challenges associated with any resurgence in COVID-19 cases; and (2) subsequent reports, on a quarterly basis until the President ends the declared emergency, that update the details submitted in the plan.

The initial report shall include

  • agency priorities for preparing for and responding to any resurgence;
  • measurable goals specific to priorities and a time line for addressing each priority;
  • anticipated challenges to addressing priorities and how the agency will address such challenges;
  • how the agency will consult with Congress, the public, state and municipal governments, and relevant stakeholders while working remotely; and
  • how the agency plans to issue relevant guidance to entities under the jurisdiction of the agency.