There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Open Book on Equal Access to Justice Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Open Book on Equal Access to Justice Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 5 and 28, United States Code, to require the maintenance of databases on awards of fees and other expenses to prevailing parties in certain administrative proceedings and court cases to which the United States is a party, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/07/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1413)
01/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
02/11/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
02/07/2019-2:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/07/2019-2:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1413)
02/07/2019-1:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 752.
02/07/2019-1:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1413-1415)
02/07/2019-1:56pmHouseMr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/01/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/24/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/24/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 02/05/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/05/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/24/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law02/01/2019 Referred to
Senate Judiciary02/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.