There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Drug-Free Communities Pandemic Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide the Administrator of the Drug-Free Communities Support Program the authority to waive the Federal fund limitation for the Drug-Free Communities Support Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/13/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/13/2020Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 07/13/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 07/13/2020
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3]* 07/13/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/16/2020
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 07/16/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/24/2020
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/29/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/29/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 08/07/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 08/14/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/11/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 09/30/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/30/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/30/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/30/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/02/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 10/09/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/13/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/20/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/13/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.