There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act
Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to provide for the dissemination of information regarding available Federal programs relating to energy efficiency projects for schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/19/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-108.
03/05/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2328)
01/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/19/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.
09/19/2019SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-108.
07/16/2019SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/06/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/05/2019-4:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2019-4:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2328)
03/05/2019-4:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 762.
03/05/2019-4:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2328-2329)
03/05/2019-4:00pmHouseMr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/24/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/24/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/24/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy01/25/2019 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/06/2019 Referred to
07/16/2019 Markup by
09/19/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-108

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.762. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (09/19/2019)

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act

This bill directs the Department of Energy's Office of Energy Efficiency and Renewable Energy to act as the lead agency for coordinating and disseminating information on existing programs and assistance that may be used to help initiate, develop, and finance energy efficiency, renewable energy, and energy retrofitting projects for schools.