There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy Innovation and Carbon Dividend Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To create a Carbon Dividend Trust Fund for the American people in order to encourage market-driven innovation of clean energy technologies and market efficiencies which will reduce harmful pollution and leave a healthier, more stable, and more prosperous nation for future generations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
01/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/24/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 01/24/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 01/28/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 01/30/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/07/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 02/08/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/11/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/12/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/22/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/04/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/06/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/07/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/08/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/18/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 03/21/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/21/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 03/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/26/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 03/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 03/27/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/08/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/10/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 04/12/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/18/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 04/18/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/25/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 04/25/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/29/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/07/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 05/20/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/28/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/28/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/10/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 06/10/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/12/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/13/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/20/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/20/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/25/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/05/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/09/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 07/11/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/15/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 07/17/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/19/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/30/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 09/06/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/06/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/16/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/24/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 09/26/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/26/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/16/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/21/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/29/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/08/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/12/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/12/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/13/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/13/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/05/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/27/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/27/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 02/10/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/13/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/21/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/24/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/24/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy01/25/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs01/24/2019 Referred to

As of 06/06/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.763 - Energy Innovation and Carbon Dividend Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.763. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2019)

Energy Innovation and Carbon Dividend Act of 2019

This bill imposes a fee on the carbon content of fuels, including crude oil, natural gas, coal, or any other product derived from those fuels that will be used so as to emit greenhouse gases into the atmosphere.

The fee is imposed on the producers or importers of the fuels and is equal to the greenhouse gas content of the fuel multiplied by the carbon fee rate. The rate begins at $15 in 2019, increases by $10 each year, and is subject to further adjustments based on the progress in meeting specified emissions reduction targets. The bill also imposes a specified fee on fluorinated greenhouse gases.

The bill includes

  • exemptions for fuels used for agricultural or nonemitting purposes,
  • exemptions for fuels used by the Armed Forces,
  • rebates for facilities that capture and sequester carbon dioxide, and
  • border adjustment provisions that require certain fees or refunds for carbon-intensive products that are exported or imported.

The fees must be deposited into a Carbon Dividend Trust Fund and used for administrative expenses and dividend payments to U.S. citizens or lawful residents. The fees must be decommissioned when emissions levels and monthly dividend payments fall below specified levels.

The bill also suspends certain regulations that limit greenhouse gas emissions. The suspensions expire if the emissions targets established by this bill are not reached after a specified time period.