There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Access to Post-COVID-19 Telehealth Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XI of the Social Security Act to authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to waive or modify application of Medicare requirements with respect to telehealth services during any emergency period, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/16/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/16/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/16/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 07/16/2020
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 07/16/2020
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 07/16/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/16/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/24/2020
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/24/2020
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 08/04/2020
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 08/11/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 08/21/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 08/21/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 08/21/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 08/21/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/01/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 09/01/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/11/2020
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/11/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/11/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 09/11/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/11/2020
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 09/22/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 09/22/2020
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 09/29/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/09/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 10/09/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 10/09/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/09/2020
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/09/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 10/09/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 10/09/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/09/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 10/23/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 10/23/2020
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/23/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/23/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/23/2020
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 10/23/2020
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 10/30/2020
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/30/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/30/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 10/30/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/17/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/17/2020
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/17/2020
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/17/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/16/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/16/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security07/16/2020 Referred to

As of 12/01/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7663 - Protecting Access to Post-COVID-19 Telehealth Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7663. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/2020)

Protecting Access to Post-COVID–19 Telehealth Act of 2020

This bill modifies requirements relating to coverage of telehealth services under Medicare.

Specifically, the bill (1) authorizes the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to generally waive coverage restrictions during national emergencies, (2) allows rural health clinics and federally qualified health centers to serve as the distant site (i.e., the location of the health care practitioner), (3) removes restrictions that require the originating site (i.e., the location of the beneficiary) to be in a rural area, and (3) allows the home of a beneficiary to serve as the originating site for all services (rather than for only certain services).

Additionally, the CMS must report on the utilization of telehealth services specifically during the public health emergency relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).