There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Mixed Earner Pandemic Unemployment Assistance Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend subtitle A of title II of division A of the CARES Act to provide Pandemic Unemployment Assistance to individuals with mixed income sources, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/20/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/20/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/20/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/20/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/20/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/23/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/23/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/23/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/23/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/23/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/29/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 07/29/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/30/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/07/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/07/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 08/14/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/14/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 08/14/2020
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 08/14/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 08/14/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 08/14/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/14/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 08/18/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 08/18/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 08/21/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/21/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/22/2020
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/08/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/08/2020
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/08/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/09/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means07/20/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support07/20/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7691. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/20/2020)

Mixed Earner Pandemic Unemployment Assistance Act of 2020

This bill allows states to provide pandemic unemployment assistance to individuals who earn a combination of regular wages and a minimum of $7,250 of self-employed annual income (1) instead of regular unemployment compensation if they are otherwise eligible, or (2) if they are still employed at their regular-wage job, but unable to earn self-employed income due to circumstances related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).

Under current law, individuals earning such mixed income are only eligible for pandemic unemployment assistance if they are not eligible for regular unemployment and unable to work due to COVID-19.