There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

COVID–19 Mine Worker Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Labor to issue an emergency temporary standard that requires operators to develop and implement a comprehensive infectious disease exposure control plan to protect miners from exposure to SARS-CoV-2, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/21/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/21/2020Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/21/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 07/21/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/21/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/22/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/22/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/22/2020
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/22/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/24/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/24/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/27/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/27/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/27/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/29/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 07/29/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 07/29/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 07/29/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 07/30/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/30/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/30/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 08/14/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/14/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 09/11/2020
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 09/11/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 09/11/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 09/21/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor07/21/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7700. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/21/2020)

COVID-19 Mine Worker Protection Act

This bill requires the Department of Labor to promulgate health and safety standards to protect coal miners from occupational exposure to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Labor shall promulgate emergency standards within seven days of this bill's enactment, and such emergency standards shall be in force until permanent standards are established.

Labor shall also collect data to track and investigate cases of exposure to COVID-19 among coal miners.