There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

No Funds for Apportionment Exclusion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the use of Federal funds to implement, administer, or enforce the Presidential Memorandum on Excluding Illegal Aliens From the Apportionment Base Following the 2020 Census, issued on July 21, 2020.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/22/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/22/2020Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/22/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 07/22/2020
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 07/23/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/23/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/23/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 07/23/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/23/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/23/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/23/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/23/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/23/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/23/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/29/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/29/2020
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/29/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/29/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/30/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/30/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/30/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/30/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/07/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 08/07/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 08/07/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/22/2020 Referred to

As of 10/31/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7724 - No Funds for Apportionment Exclusion Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7724. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/22/2020)

No Funds for Apportionment Exclusion Act

This bill prohibits using federal funds to carry out the July 21, 2020, presidential memorandum ordering the exclusion of aliens without legal immigration status from being counted for the purposes of apportioning representation in the House of Representatives following the 2020 census.