There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend certain employment and reemployment rights to members of the National Guard who perform State active duty.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/17/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/17/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/15/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/24/2020Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 08/28/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/24/2020 Referred to
09/17/2020 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity09/15/2020 Referred to

As of 11/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7785 - To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend certain employment and reemployment rights to members of the National Guard who perform State active duty.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7785. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/24/2020)

This bill extends certain employment and reemployment rights and benefits to members of the National Guard who perform state active duty.