There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fairness for Seniors and People with Disabilities During COVID-19 Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide protections to Social Security and Supplemental Security Income beneficiaries relating to extra payments due to the COVID-19 pandemic, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/29/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/29/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 07/29/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 08/07/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/07/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 08/07/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 08/07/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 08/07/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 08/07/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/07/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 08/07/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/07/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/07/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 08/07/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/07/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/11/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 08/11/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 08/11/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 08/11/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/04/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 09/04/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/04/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/04/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/29/2020 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/29/2020 Referred to

As of 10/28/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7830 - Fairness for Seniors and People with Disabilities During COVID-19 Act of 2020


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.