There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Removing Barriers to Basic Needs Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To temporarily waive section 115 of the Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act of 1996 as applied to the TANF and SNAP programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/31/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/11/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/31/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/31/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/31/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/04/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 08/04/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/04/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/04/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 08/04/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/11/2020
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/11/2020
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/11/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 08/11/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/11/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/11/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/11/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 08/11/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/18/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/04/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/31/2020 Referred to
House Agriculture07/31/2020 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations09/11/2020 Referred to

As of 10/30/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.7916 - Removing Barriers to Basic Needs Act of 2020


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7916. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/31/2020)

Removing Barriers to Basic Needs Act of 2020

This bill modifies eligibility requirements under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program and the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP, formerly known as the food stamp program) to temporarily waive requirements related to the denial of assistance and benefits for certain drug-related convictions.

Any state law, policy, or regulation that imposes conditions on eligibility for SNAP and TANF based on an individual's conviction of an offense related to a controlled substance shall have no force or effect until December 31, 2022.