There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Savings Through Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide appropriations to secure the southern border of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
03/05/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/01/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
01/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/25/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2019Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Appropriations01/25/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor01/25/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary01/25/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship03/05/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security01/25/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations02/13/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture01/25/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/25/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support03/01/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/25/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/28/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.796.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.796. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/2019)

Savings Through Security Act

This bill provides appropriations to the Department of Homeland Security for the procurement and deployment of infrastructure, technology, and manpower to secure the international border between the United States and Mexico.

The bill also requires specified federal agencies to (1) report on costs associated with expenditures on unauthorized aliens, and (2) remit to the Treasury certain savings that are attributable to the funds provided by this bill to secure the international border between the United States and Mexico.