There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Coin Metal Modification Authorization and Cost Savings Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Coin Metal Modification Authorization and Cost Savings Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 31, United States Code, to save Federal funds by authorizing changes to the composition of circulating coins, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/02/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 343 - 41 (Roll no. 228).(text: CR H6037)
08/11/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/03/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
12/02/2020-7:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/02/2020-7:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 343 - 41 (Roll no. 228). (text: CR H6037)
12/02/2020-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6039-6040)
12/02/2020-5:15pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/02/2020-5:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7995.
12/02/2020-5:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6037-6039)
12/02/2020-5:00pmHouseMr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/11/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
08/11/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 08/11/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 10/09/2020
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 10/20/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 12/02/2020
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 12/02/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services08/11/2020 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/03/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.7995. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/02/2020)

Coin Metal Modification Authorization and Cost Savings Act of 2020

This bill authorizes the United States Mint to modify the metallic composition of circulating coins (including by prescribing reasonable manufacturing tolerances with respect to those coins) if a study and analysis conducted by the Mint indicates that the modification will

  • reduce costs incurred by the taxpayers;
  • be seamless, which shall be determined by verifying that the coins will work interchangeably in most coin acceptors using electromagnetic signature technology; and
  • have as minimal an adverse impact as possible on the public and stakeholders.

The Mint must notify Congress before making the modification and provide a justification for the modification.