There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Make Billionaires Pay Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose an emergency tax on the increase in wealth of billionaires during the COVID-19 pandemic in order to pay out-of-pocket healthcare expenses of the uninsured and under-insured, including prescription drugs, for one year.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/11/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
10/06/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/10/2020Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/11/2020Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/11/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means08/11/2020 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce08/11/2020 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform08/11/2020 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs08/11/2020 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health10/06/2020 Referred to
House Armed Services08/11/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources08/11/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States09/10/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.8020. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/11/2020)

Make Billionaires Pay Act

This bill establishes a tax on the wealth increases of individuals with more than $1 billion in net assets during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic and requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to pay the out-of-pocket expenses of individuals receiving medically-necessary care or services for a period of one year.

First, the bill requires individuals with net assets of more than $1 billion on December 31, 2020, to pay a tax of 60% on the amount equal to the lesser of (1) the increase in value of their net assets during the period beginning on March 18, 2020, through such date, or (2) the value of their net assets that is greater than $1 billion. The Department of the Treasury must establish rules for the application of this tax to married individuals and this tax is not deductible for the purpose of federal income tax.

Further, the bill covers the costs for services provided through public or private health insurance and to uninsured individuals, including prescription drugs and care related to COVID-19, for a period of one year beginning on the date of enactment of this bill. Health insurance plans are prohibited from increasing the cost-sharing requirements of plans while this program is in effect and HHS must report to Congress on the program on a weekly basis.