There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Colorado Outdoor Recreation and Economy Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • San Juan Mountains Wilderness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the designation of certain wilderness areas, recreation management areas, and conservation areas in the State of Colorado, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
06/26/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
06/26/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/26/2019Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
04/02/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
02/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/28/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/28/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/28/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/28/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 03/21/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/28/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/07/2019 Referred to
04/02/2019 Hearings by
06/26/2019 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/07/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.