There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

BETTER Kidney Care Act
Bringing Enhanced Treatments and Therapies to ESRD Recipients Kidney Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a demonstration program to provide integrated care for Medicare beneficiaries with end-stage renal disease, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/15/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
09/15/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/15/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/15/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 09/15/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/15/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/15/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/15/2020
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 09/15/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 09/15/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/16/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/17/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 09/18/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/22/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/22/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 09/23/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/23/2020
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/23/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/24/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 09/24/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/24/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/29/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/29/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 09/29/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 09/29/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/29/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/29/2020
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 09/29/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 09/29/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/29/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/30/2020
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/30/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 09/30/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/30/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/30/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 09/30/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/01/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/01/2020
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/01/2020
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/01/2020
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 10/01/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 10/09/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 10/09/2020
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/09/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/09/2020
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 10/09/2020
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 10/09/2020
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 10/09/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/09/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/16/2020
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/16/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 10/16/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/16/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/16/2020
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/16/2020
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/16/2020
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/16/2020
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 10/16/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/15/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/15/2020 Referred to

As of 10/20/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.8254 - BETTER Kidney Care Act


Subjects (0)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.