There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Businesses Preparing for a Better Tomorrow Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide a payroll tax credit for best practices training expenses associated with protecting employees from COVID-19.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/15/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/15/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/15/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/30/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/17/2020
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/19/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means09/15/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.8260. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/15/2020)

Businesses Preparing for a Better Tomorrow Act

This bill allows employers a payroll tax credit in each calendar quarter of 50% of the their qualified workplace training expenses paid or incurred after March 12, 2020, and before January 21, 2021. The bill defines qualified workplace training expenses as employer expenses for education and training for the health and safety of employees in the workplace with respect to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), and the prevention of the spread of COVID-19 in the workplace.