There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the President to posthumously award the Medal of Honor to Alwyn C. Cashe for acts of valor during Operation Iraqi Freedom.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/04/2020Became Public Law No: 116-210. (TXT | PDF)
12/04/2020Signed by President.
11/24/2020Presented to President.
11/10/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/22/2020Committee on Armed Services discharged.
09/16/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/04/2020Became Public Law No: 116-210. (TXT | PDF)
12/04/2020Signed by President.
11/24/2020HousePresented to President.
11/12/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/10/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6654-6655)
09/23/2020SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/22/2020-8:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2020-8:18pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4705)
09/22/2020-8:18pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4705)
09/22/2020HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
09/22/2020-8:18pmHouseMs. Horn, Kendra S. asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/16/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
09/16/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2]* 09/16/2020
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 09/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services09/16/2020 Referred to
09/22/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.8276. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-210 (12/04/2020)

This bill authorizes the President to award the Medal of Honor posthumously to Alwyn C. Cashe for acts of valor during Operation Iraqi Freedom.