There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Whole Milk for Healthy Kids Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to allow schools that participate in the school lunch program under such Act to serve whole milk.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/14/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2004)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 02/07/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/07/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 02/07/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 02/11/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 02/14/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/07/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/07/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 03/25/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/25/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/01/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 04/29/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/29/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/01/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/08/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 06/04/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 06/12/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 06/19/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/24/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 07/16/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 09/09/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 09/09/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 09/11/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 09/20/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/20/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 10/17/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/30/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/17/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/30/2020
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1] 09/16/2020
Rep. Tiffany, Thomas P. [R-WI-7] 11/02/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor01/29/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.832.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.832. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2019)

Whole Milk for Healthy Kids Act of 2019

This bill allows schools participating in the National School Lunch Program to serve flavored and unflavored whole milk.