Summary: H.R.8325 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.8325. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/21/2020)

Operation Feed Our Kids Act

This bill extends authority through December 31, 2021, for the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to issue waivers of requirements under the National School Lunch Program, the School Breakfast Program, the Child and Adult Care Food Program, and the summer food service program for children due to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Under current law, such waiver authority expires on September 30, 2020.

Additionally, USDA must extend through at least the end of the 2020-2021 school year all of the child nutrition waivers granted under the Families First Coronavirus Response Act that as of September 11, 2020, were set to expire on December 31, 2020.