There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Life and Taxpayers Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit Federal funding to entities that do not certify the entities will not perform, or provide any funding to any other entity that performs, an abortion.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/29/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 01/29/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steven C., Jr. [R-KS-2]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 01/29/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/11/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/11/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 02/25/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 03/07/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/26/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 04/29/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/29/2019 Referred to

As of 08/06/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.833 - Protecting Life and Taxpayers Act of 2019


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.833. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2019)

Protecting Life and Taxpayers Act of 2019

This bill requires federally funded entities to certify that they will not perform, and will not provide funds to any other entity that performs, an abortion, except in cases of rape or incest or where a physical condition endangers the woman's life unless an abortion is performed.