There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

BUILDER Act of 2020
Building United States Infrastructure through Limited Delays and Efficient Reviews Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 to clarify ambiguous provisions, align the Act with relevant case law, reflect modern technologies, optimize interagency coordination, and facilitate a more efficient, effective, and timely environmental review process.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/22/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/22/2020Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/22/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 09/22/2020
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 09/22/2020
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 09/23/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 09/23/2020
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 09/23/2020
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 09/23/2020
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 09/24/2020
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/24/2020
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 09/24/2020
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 09/24/2020
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/24/2020
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 09/29/2020
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/29/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/29/2020
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/29/2020
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/29/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 09/29/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/29/2020
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 09/29/2020
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/02/2020
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/02/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/02/2020
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/02/2020
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/23/2020
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 10/23/2020
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 10/23/2020
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources09/22/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.8333.


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.