There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Rodchenkov Anti-Doping Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Rodchenkov Anti-Doping Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Rodchenkov Anti-Doping Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Rodchenkov Anti-Doping Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Rodchenkov Anti-Doping Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose criminal sanctions on certain persons involved in international doping fraud conspiracies, to provide restitution for victims of such conspiracies, and to require sharing of information with the United States Anti-Doping Agency to assist its fight against doping, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
11/24/2020Presented to President.
11/16/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6693)
08/06/2020Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-247.
10/22/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8340)
10/22/2019Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
10/22/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-251, Part I.
01/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/24/2020HousePresented to President.
11/17/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6693)
08/06/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 509.
08/06/2020SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-247.
03/11/2020SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/23/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
10/22/2019-4:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/22/2019-4:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8340)
10/22/2019-3:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 835.
10/22/2019-3:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8339-8345)
10/22/2019-3:42pmHouseMs. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/22/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 200.
10/22/2019HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
10/22/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-251, Part I.
10/16/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/16/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/15/2019HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
03/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/29/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/29/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/29/2019HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1271)
01/29/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (28)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/29/2019 Referred to
10/16/2019 Markup by
10/22/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-251
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/25/2019 Referred to
10/15/2019 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce01/29/2019 Referred to
10/22/2019 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/23/2019 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
08/06/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-247

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.835. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (11/16/2020)

Rodchenkov Anti-Doping Act of 2019

This bill makes it unlawful to knowingly influence (or attempt or conspire to influence) a major international sports competition by use of a prohibited substance or prohibited method.

A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to 10 years, or both—and mandatory restitution. Additionally, property may be seized and forfeited to the U.S. government if it was used or intended to be used to commit an offense or traceable to the proceeds in connection with an offense.