There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

PTC Elimination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the credit for electricity produced from certain renewable resources, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/23/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/23/2020Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/23/2020Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 09/23/2020
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/29/2020
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/17/2020
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/18/2020
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 11/18/2020
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/18/2020
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/08/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means09/23/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.8359. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/23/2020)

PTC Elimination Act

This bill repeals the tax credit for producing electricity from renewable resources (e.g., wind, biomass, trash, geothermal or solar energy facilities). The bill also expresses the sense of Congress that such credit should be allowed to expire and should not be extended.